Gentili, Fred (CPSO#: 26037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4 - Room 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5250
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gentili ( CPSO# 26037 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Room 445 4th Floor
West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5250


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016


Corporation Name: F. Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gentili ( CPSO# 26037 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4
Room 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 483-9161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRED GENTILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GENTILI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1973