Georgantopoulos, Christos (CPSO#: 60689)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 28 Jul 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Dec 2006
Summary:

 On December 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Christos Georgantopoulos committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in 
 conduct unbecoming a physician.

The Discipline Committee ordered that and directed that:

1.  
 	Dr. Georgantopoulos appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2.	The Registrar suspend Dr. 
 Georgantopoulos( certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, all of which will 
 be suspended if Dr. Georgantopoulos completes the College(s Boundaries Course, and an anger 
 management program approved by the College, and provides proof of such completion, within six (6) 
 months of the date of the imposition of this penalty.

 3.  	Dr. Georgantopoulos to pay to the 
 College costs in the amount of $2,500.00.

 4.  	The results of this proceeding to be included in 
 the register.

At the completion of the hearing Dr. Georgantopoulos waived his right to appeal and 
 the public reprimand was administered.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 05, 2006