George, Lindsey Jane (CPSO#: 68912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 James Street North
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Phone: (905) 667-4848
Fax: (905) 667-4873
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSEY JANE GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000