George, Ralph Levi (CPSO#: 54567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
CIBC Breast Centre
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 7145
Fax: (416) 864-5965
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ralph George Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. George ( CPSO# 54567 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
3rd Floor Queen Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALPH LEVI GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2001