George, Sabine Rosemarie (CPSO#: 57511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig's Univ, Giessen, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
81 The East Mall, 3rd Floor
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone: 647-818-4459
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: 81 The East Mall Etobicoke, ON M8Z 5W3
Instructions: You may request chart transfers by email at drgeorgecharts@gmail.com or mail request to Dr. Sabine George at address above.
Date Received: 21 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINE ROSEMARIE GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 07 Jan 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1991