George, Stevan William (CPSO#: 19036)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1996