Gerace, Rocco Vincent (CPSO#: 25637)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 14 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: (416) 967-2600 Ext. 400
Fax: (416) 967-2618
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seccareccia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Seccareccia ( CPSO# 58186 )
Dr. R. Gerace ( CPSO# 25637 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROCCO VINCENT GERACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERACE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973