Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Geranmayegan, Amir Ali (CPSO#: 59924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1525 Albion Road
Rexdale ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 740-0956
Fax: (416) 740-0958
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Center
Etobicoke General Site
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Amir Geranmayegan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Geranmayegan ( CPSO# 59924 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
1525 Albion Road
Rexdale ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 740-0956

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR ALI GERANMAYEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERANMAYEGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989