Gerber Finn, Lianne Michelle (CPSO#: 86340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
61 Queen St
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: (807) 737-5114
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerber Finn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gerber Finn ( CPSO# 86340 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
61 Queen Street
P.O. Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-5160

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE MICHELLE GERBER FINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBER FINN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009