Gerein, Richard Bradley (CPSO#: 79361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Gerein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gerein ( CPSO# 79361 )

Business Address:
Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD BRADLEY GEREIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEREIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2004