Gerges, Maha Fayek Gobran (CPSO#: 85057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maha Gerges Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gerges ( CPSO# 85057 )

Business Address:
Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (647) 973-9330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA FAYEK GOBRAN GERGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERGES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008