Germain, Louis-Philippe (CPSO#: 78787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique de chirurgie esthétique
de Gatineau
Suite A101
540 boulevard de l'Hopital
Gatineau QC  J8V 3T2
Phone: (819) 561-3030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS-PHILIPPE GERMAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2003 to 06 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016