German, Jennifer Mary (CPSO#: 88824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Lamb, Jennifer Mary (used until: 08 Aug 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: 416-482-8880
Fax: 416-482-8881
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer German Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. German ( CPSO# 88824 )

Business Address:
202 - 2409 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone Number: (416) 482-8880

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARY GERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010