Germond, Colin John (CPSO#: 57841)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin J. Germond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 9 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2009