Gerrie, Alexandra Jean (CPSO#: 62427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Core Family Health
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone: (519) 963-1875
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerrie Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gerrie ( CPSO# 62427 )
Dr. J. Kay ( CPSO# 60917 )

Business Address:
Core Family Health
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Business Address:
209 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 667-2221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA JEAN GERRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991