Gershony, Gary (CPSO#: 32875)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Sep 1991