Gerson, Bridgette Courtney (CPSO#: 103434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Columbia St
Kamloops BC  V2C2T1
Phone: 2503142782
Fax: 5192502280

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIDGETTE COURTNEY GERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017