Gerstein, Betty Frances (CPSO#: 62452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Sheppard Ave West
North York ON  M2N 1M2
Phone: (416) 222-1477
Fax: (416) 222-5707
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Centre A107
205 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9W 5L7
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-6622 Ext. 4533
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY FRANCES GERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991