Gerstein, Hertzel Chaim (CPSO#: 50631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine, HSC3V38
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73371
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hertzel C. Gerstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gerstein ( CPSO# 50631 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERTZEL CHAIM GERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1984