Gerstle, Justin Theodore (CPSO#: 69476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of General & Thoracic Surgery
Roy Hill Wing Room 1526C
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6401
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.T. Gerstle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gerstle ( CPSO# 69476 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN THEODORE GERSTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERSTLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Paediatric Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2002