Gertenstein, Robyn Joy (CPSO#: 67683)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Nov 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Oct 1994 to 18 Nov 1994
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 1994