Gertler, Stanley (CPSO#: 53066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TOHCC
General Campus
Suite 913
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70179
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stan Gertler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gertler ( CPSO# 53066 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Suite 913
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 05 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY GERTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERTLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1987