Gertner, Eliyahu Elie (CPSO#: 32789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Head Internal Medicine
St Paul MN  55101
United States
Phone: 651-254-3486

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIYAHU ELIE GERTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERTNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1981