Gertzbein, Stanley David (CPSO#: 21371)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010