Gerulath, Alwis Horst (CPSO#: 24368)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michaels Hospital, 30 Bond Street,Toronto, ON, M5B 1W8
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Mar 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016