Gervais, Carole (CPSO#: 62714)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 64047, Holland Cross, ON, K1Y 4V1
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016