Gervais, Danielle Denette (CPSO#: 75041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: Gervais-Fagnou, Danielle Denette (used until: 26 Aug 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
300 - 100 Marie Curie Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE DENETTE GERVAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERVAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002