Getahun, Tajedin Yenus (CPSO#: 74965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 202
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone: (905) 897-1119
Fax: (905) 897-1100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tajedin Getahun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Getahun ( CPSO# 74965 )

Business Address:
Unit 406
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2

Business Address:
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 897-1119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAJEDIN YENUS GETAHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GETAHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On January 14, 2014, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Tajedin Yenus Getahun in respect of an incident that took place in November 2005.