Getu, Haregua (CPSO#: 55371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2009 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J7
Phone: (416) 690-7269
Fax: (416) 690-1864
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

294 Main St.
Suit 205
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Canada
Phone: 416 690 7269
Fax: 416-690 1864
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haregua Getu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Getu ( CPSO# 55371 )

Business Address:
2009 Danforth Avenue
Suite 102
Toronto ON  M4C 1J7
Phone Number: (416) 690-7269

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAREGUA GETU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GETU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1986