Geurtjens, Carla Marie (CPSO#: 98309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 Conestoga Blvd
unit B10
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

430 The Boarwalk
Suite 208
Waterloo ON  N1R 7L7
Canada
Phone: 519-742-0107
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Aug 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA MARIE GEURTJENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEURTJENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016