Ghadaki, Bahareh (CPSO#: 92804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines, ON L2S 0A9
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 44460
Fax: 289-398-1031
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bahareh Ghadaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ghadaki ( CPSO# 92804 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
Department of Infection & Prevention Control
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHAREH GHADAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADAKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015