Ghadially, Ruby (CPSO#: 54325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sheffield, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
1701 Divisadero Street
San Francisco CA  94115
United States
Phone: (415) 353-7800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUBY GHADIALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADIALLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009