Ghaffar, Abdul (CPSO#: 21705)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Karachi, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Great Lakes Medical Centre 25 Great Lakes Drive Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Date Received: 01 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abdul Ghaffar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 2, 2018:

Dr. Ghaffar was the subject of a College investigation into his practice. During the investigation, Dr. Ghaffar resigned his certificate of registration, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)