Ghaffar, Omar (CPSO#: 77927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
Centre for Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: 1-800-341-6323
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar Ghaffar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ghaffar ( CPSO# 77927 )

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (800) 341-6323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR GHAFFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007