Ghaffar-Sedeh, Maryam (CPSO#: 81774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghaffar-Sedeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghaffar-Sedeh ( CPSO# 81774 )

Business Address:
207 - 7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone Number: (905) 597-5919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Aug 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM GHAFFAR-SEDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR-SEDEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 22 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006