Ghali, Samia Saad Kamel (CPSO#: 65654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
3184 Stocksbridge Ave
Oakville ON  L6M 0A7
Phone: (905) 827-7967
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samia Ghali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIA SAAD KAMEL GHALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996