Ghani, Ikram (CPSO#: 78399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-4036
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Multispecialty Medical Clinic
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-9229
Fax: (905) 897-0788
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Rexdale Doctors Clinic
Unit 39A
1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 744-3019
Fax: (416) 744-6560
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ikram Ghani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ghani ( CPSO# 78399 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
111 - 21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9229

Business Address:
39A - 1530 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1B4
Phone Number: (416) 744-3019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ikram Ghani may practise medicine independently in internal medicine, only.