Ghani, Mansura Shakur (CPSO#: 63764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prairie Cardiovascular Consultants
P O Box 19420
Springfield IL  62794-9420
United States
Phone: (217) 788-0706
Fax: (217) 525-2535

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSURA SHAKUR GHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992