Ghantous, Youssef (CPSO#: 69053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 933-1441
Fax: (613) 933-1977
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ghantous Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ghantous ( CPSO# 69053 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 933-1441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSSEF GHANTOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANTOUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997