Gharakhanian, Garen (CPSO#: 54497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Persian

Education:University of Karachi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
70 colony farm road
coquitlam BC  V3C 5X9
Phone: (604) 524-7923

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Nevada
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAREN GHARAKHANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARAKHANIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986