Ghareeb, Sumaya Mohamed (CPSO#: 76948)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003