Gharghi, Daryoush (CPSO#: 87288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 4221
Fax: (905) 428-5335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 326
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Unit 102
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (647) 345-2444
Fax: (647) 345-2445
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daryoush Gharghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gharghi ( CPSO# 87288 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 881-0511

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYOUSH GHARGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013