Gharsaa, Osama Suleiman (CPSO#: 78957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6156
Fax: (905) 721-6649
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

111 simcoe stree n unit 100
Oshawa ON  L1G4S4
Canada
Phone: 2893161645
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gharsaa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Gharsaa ( CPSO# 78957 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6156

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Durham ON  M4N 3M5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSAMA SULEIMAN GHARSAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARSAA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008