Ghate, Hemant Bhalchandra (CPSO#: 55139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 255-2130
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52201
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Surgical Center Inc
2224 Walker Road
Suite 320
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Canada
Phone: (519) 256-8111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot street west
Leamington, Ontario
Leamington ON  N8H 3X2
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Herzig Eye Institute
131 Bloor Street West, suite 210
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Canada
Phone: 416-929-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Provis-Rudd Clinic
123 Edward Street, suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-0997
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
700-790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-551-6006
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hemant B. Ghate Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghate ( CPSO# 55139 )

Business Address:
Windsor Laser Eye Institute
Suite 198
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Phone Number: (519) 252-2020

Business Address:
Crystal Clear Vision
33 Hazelton Avenue
Toronto ON  M5R 2E3

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMANT BHALCHANDRA GHATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHATE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992