Ghazan-Shahi, Sassan (CPSO#: 86669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: Ghazanshahi, Sassan (used until: 05 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sassan Ghazan-Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ghazan-Shahi ( CPSO# 86669 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SASSAN GHAZAN-SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZAN-SHAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 02 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 03 Aug 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 05 May 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Nov 2009 to 03 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Nov 2010 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 04 Nov 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2012