Ghazarian, Boulos Alfred (CPSO#: 67126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 383-0003
Fax: (519) 383-6499
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boulos Ghazarian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ghazarian ( CPSO# 67126 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 383-0003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOULOS ALFRED GHAZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZARIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1998