Ghazarian, Danny Mugur Daniel (CPSO#: 66188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Suite 205
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3839
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY MUGUR DANIEL GHAZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZARIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 27 Jan 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 27 Jan 1995
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 27 Jan 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 27 Jan 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 27 Jan 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1997