Ghazavi, Mohammad Taghi (CPSO#: 67809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Surrey Medical Center
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Canada
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TAGHI GHAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZAVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 14 Mar 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2008