Ghaznavi, Sameera (CPSO#: 58603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Names: Ghaznavi-Tewari, Sameera (used until: 23 Aug 2000 )     Ghaznavi-Tewari, Sameera (used until: 10 Apr 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsridge Medical Centre
Unit 2
2015 Kingsridge Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 4Y7
Phone: (905) 827-3006
Fax: (905) 825-9431
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6465 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 5R3
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4001
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEERA GHAZNAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZNAVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989