Ghazwani, Yahya Qasim M (CPSO#: 88069)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2008 to 07 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011